Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.01.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
17.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.12.2021 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.01.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2020 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.07.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.07.2020 | First examination report | |
13.03.2020 | Change - applicant | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
07.02.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
07.02.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
07.02.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
03.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.06.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
26.01.2019 | Change - representative |