EP3527204 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION FOR BEDWETTING AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wellesley Pharmaceuticals, LLC 3 Valley View Drive Newtown, PA 18940 / US | For all designated states Dill, David A. 3 Valley View Drive Newtown, PA 18940 / US | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DILL, David, A. 3 Valley View Drive Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | TL Brand & Co 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19153805.7 | 28.06.2013 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | US201213560665 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: US201213560665 | US201313800761 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313800761 | US201313847940 | 20.03.2013 Original published format: US201313847940 | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527204 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61K31/192, A61K31/405, A61K9/28, A61K9/22, A61K45/06, A61K9/24, A61K31/12, A61K31/167, A61K31/437, A61K31/4985, A61K31/60, A61K38/48, A61K31/616, A61P13/00 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/616 (US);
A61K38/4893 (US);
A61K45/06 (CN,US);
A61K9/0002 (CN);
A61P13/00 (EP,US);
C12Y304/24069 (US);
A61K2300/00 (CN);
A61K9/209 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP,US,CN);
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K31/405, A61K2300/00 (EP,US,CN);
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (CN,US,EP);
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (CN,US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG GEGEN BETTNÄSSEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2019/34] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION FOR BEDWETTING AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | [2019/34] | French: | FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR ÉNURÉSIE NOCTURNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 22.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 01.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13823428.1 / EP2844241 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012135050 (DILL DAVID A [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, paragraphs 0008-0010 * * page -; example - *; | [IY] - AL-WAILI N S, "Increased urinary nitrite excretion in primary enuresis: Effects of indomethacin treatment on urinary and serum osmolality and electrolytes, urinary volumes and nitrite excretion", BJU INTERNATIONAL, (200208), vol. 90, no. 3, ISSN 1464-4096, pages 294 - 301, XP055177413 [I] 1-4 * abstract * * page 295, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 298; table 2 * * page 300, column 1, paragraphs 3-4 * [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1464-410X.2002.02803.x | [A] - DESHPANDE ANIRUDDH V ET AL, "Medical management of nocturnal enuresis", PAEDIATRIC DRUGS, NEW ZEALAND, (201204), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.2165/11594870-000000000-00000, ISSN 1179-2019, pages 71 - 77, XP009183275 [A] 1-4 * page 76, column 1, paragraph l - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/11594870-000000000-00000 |