EP3542883 - HYDRAULIC TANK AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARGO-HYTOS Group AG Neuhofstraße 1 6340 Baar / CH | [2021/21] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states FSP Fluid Systems Partners Holding AG Rebmattli 20 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiser, Thomas Kloster-Lorsch-Straße 10 74889 Sinsheim / DE | 02 /
Trunner, Daniel Ortenaustraße 9 76703 Kraichtal / DE | 03 /
Schleuter, Tanja Waldseerstraße 121 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 04 /
Stech, Jörg Buchenstraße 38 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/27] |
Former [2019/39] | Kilchert, Jochen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19154476.6 | 30.01.2019 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | DE201810106499 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: DE102018106499 | [2019/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542883 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3542883 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/027 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
B29C69/02 (EP);
B01D35/0273 (EP);
B29D22/003 (CN);
F15B1/26 (EP,CN);
F15B21/041 (EP);
B29C41/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2019/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKTANK UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2019/39] | English: | HYDRAULIC TANK AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING | [2019/39] | French: | RÉSERVOIR HYDRAULIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2022 | 22.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | LU | 30.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SI | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 05.07.2023 | |
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 05.07.2023 | |
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5782223 (YAMASHITA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [XY]CN102414042 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 * [Y] 5-7; | [YA]US2016023145 (GRECO ENRICO [IT], et al) [Y] 5-7 * figure 9 * [A] 1-4,8-11; | [A]US2017122170 (FAHRENKRUG MATTHEW F [US], et al) [A] 1-11* figure 3 * | Examination | WO2010122065 |