EP3537512 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE, NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING POSITIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORITA, Koji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
OCHIAI, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | 03 /
FUKUMOTO, Yusuke c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | 04 /
SHIMAMURA, Harunari c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | 05 /
ASARI, Takuya c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | [2023/07] |
Former [2019/37] | 01 /
TORITA, Koji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
OCHIAI, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUMOTO, Yusuke c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
SHIMAMURA, Harunari c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | |||
05 /
ASARI, Takuya c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/08] |
Former [2019/37] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 19154477.4 | 30.01.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | JP20180039786 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018039786 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537512 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3537512 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/131, H01M4/1391, H01M4/36, H01M4/485, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M10/0525, H01M10/42 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
H01M4/667 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/04 (BR,RU);
H01M4/131 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/043 (EP,CN,US);
C23C22/56 (KR);
C23C22/68 (KR);
H01M10/04 (RU);
H01M10/052 (BR,KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0435 (KR);
H01M4/0471 (CN);
H01M4/13 (BR);
H01M4/139 (CN);
H01M4/1391 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (KR,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M4/624 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/626 (EP,US);
H01M4/66 (BR);
H01M4/661 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/664 (CN,US);
H01M4/70 (CN);
H01M2004/021 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODE, SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POSITIVELEKTRODE | [2019/37] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE, NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING POSITIVE ELECTRODE | [2019/37] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 10.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | IT | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | NL | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
IT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SI | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
NL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005197149 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0042] *; | [XI]US2008318130 (OGAWA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] , [0022] , [0025] , [0027] , [0029] , [0032] - [0037] - [0074]; figure 1 * [I] 4,8,9; | [XI]US2017352866 (KAWAI YUKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0065] , [0076] , [0081] , [0082] , [0089] , [0102] , [0124] , [0125]; figures 3,4 * [I] 2,4-6,8,9 | by applicant | JP2016072221 | JP2018039786 |