EP3501617 - MULTI-STEP SEPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Pharma (Callanish) Limited 4th and 5th Floors 2 Stockport Exchange Railway Road Stockport SK1 3GG / GB | [2021/24] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states BASF Pharma (Callanish) Limited PO Box 4, Earl Road Cheadle Hulme Cheadle, Cheshire SK8 6QG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLIHER, Adam c/o BASF Pharma (Callanish) Limited P.O. Box 4 Earl Road Cheadle Hulme Cheadle, Cheshire SK8 6QG / GB | 02 /
MORRISON, Angus c/o BASF Pharma (Callanish) Limited P.O. Box 4 Earl Road Cheadle Hulme Cheadle, Cheshire SK8 6QG / GB | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/05] |
Former [2019/26] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19154557.3 | 09.01.2014 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | GB20130000354 | 09.01.2013 Original published format: GB 201300354 | US201361750389P | 09.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361750389 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501617 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501617 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/18, C11B7/00, A23D9/04, C11B3/10, C11C1/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A23D9/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D15/18 (RU);
B01D15/185 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C11C1/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D15/08 (US);
B01D15/1892 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D15/42 (RU);
B01D15/426 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C57/03 (US);
C07C69/587 (US);
C11B3/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C11B7/0008 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGES TRENNVERFAHREN | [2019/26] | English: | MULTI-STEP SEPARATION PROCESS | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION EN PLUSIEURS ÉTAPES | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 18.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14700116.8 / EP2943261 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2023 | CZ | 01.02.2023 | DK | 01.02.2023 | EE | 01.02.2023 | FI | 01.02.2023 | HR | 01.02.2023 | IT | 01.02.2023 | LT | 01.02.2023 | LV | 01.02.2023 | MC | 01.02.2023 | NL | 01.02.2023 | PL | 01.02.2023 | RO | 01.02.2023 | RS | 01.02.2023 | SE | 01.02.2023 | SI | 01.02.2023 | SK | 01.02.2023 | SM | 01.02.2023 | GR | 02.05.2023 | IS | 01.06.2023 | PT | 01.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
IT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SI | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SK | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
CZ | 01.02.2023 | ||
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RO | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
EE | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
DK | 01.02.2023 | ||
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
SM | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
IS | 01.06.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
PL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
GR | 02.05.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
FI | 01.02.2023 | ||
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
LV | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
SE | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 01.02.2023 | |
HR | 01.02.2023 | ||
LT | 01.02.2023 | ||
NL | 01.02.2023 | ||
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.02.2023 | |
RS | 01.02.2023 | ||
PT | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9425552 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO], et al) [X] 14,15 * examples 2,3 * * page 33, line 17 - line 27 * [I] 1-13; | [XA]WO2007075499 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * claims 1-3 * [A] 1-13; | [XP]WO2013005048 (BASF PHARMA CALLANISH LTD [GB], et al) [XP] 1-15 * page 34, line 23 - page 35, line 9; claim - *; | [E]WO2015086607 (NOVASEP PROCESS [FR]) [E] 1-15* figure -; claim - * |