EP3576116 - MAGNETIC COMPONENT AND SWITCH POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Electronics, Inc. 31-1 Xingbang Road Guishan Industrial Zone Taoyuan City 33370 / TW | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Zengyi 31-1 Xingbang Road, Guishan Industrial Zone Taoyuan City 33370 / TW | 02 /
HONG, Tianding 31-1 Xingbang Road, Guishan Industrial Zone Taoyuan City 33370 / TW | 03 /
YANG, Haijun 31-1 Xingbang Road, Guishan Industrial Zone Taoyuan City 33370 / TW | 04 /
ZHANG, Jinfa 31-1 Xingbang Road, Guishan Industrial Zone Taoyuan City 33370 / TW | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 19154662.1 | 31.01.2019 | [2019/49] | Priority number, date | CN201810522699 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810522699 | [2019/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576116 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3576116 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/00 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
H01F38/00 (EP,US);
H01F27/24 (CN,US);
H01F27/32 (US);
H01F27/28 (CN);
H01F27/2823 (US);
H01F27/29 (US);
H01F27/40 (CN);
H02M3/285 (EP);
H02M3/33576 (EP,CN,US);
H01F2027/408 (CN);
H01F2038/006 (EP);
H02M1/0064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2019/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE KOMPONENTE UND SCHALTNETZTEILVORRICHTUNG | [2019/49] | English: | MAGNETIC COMPONENT AND SWITCH POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2019/49] | French: | COMPOSANT MAGNÉTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE COMMUTATION | [2019/49] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 30.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | LU | 31.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP3054593 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-14,17 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 38 - page 11, paragraph 61 * * figures 2,4-9,14 * * page 2, paragraphs 4-8 * [Y] 5,8,9,15,16,19,20 [I] 18; | [XY]CN106057402 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-7,11-14 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 53 - page 9, paragraph 69 * [Y] 15; | [Y]US2017345756 (YIN GUODONG [CN], et al) [Y] 5,8,9,15,16,19,20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 4-10 *; | [Y]US2017345541 (YANG HAIJUN [CN], et al) [Y] 8,9,15,16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 3, paragraphs 40-42 * * page 4, paragraphs 57,58 ** figures 4,9 * |