EP3502057 - ELECTROCHEMICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FEATURING OPTIMAL MEMBRANE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Energy, LLC 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda MD 20817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Energy, LLC 6801 Rockledge Drive Berthesda MD 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMADEO, Desiree 48 Meadow Lane Lunenburg, MA 01462 / US | 02 /
ESSWEIN, Arthur J. 1930 Grove Street Apt. 3 San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 03 /
GOELTZ, John 340 Corona Road Carmel, CA 93923 / US | 04 /
JARVI, Thomas D. 166 Kennedy Road Manchester, CT 06042 / US | 05 /
KING, Evan R. 59 Faxon Park Road Quincy, MA 02169 / US | 06 /
MADDEN, Thomas H. 2767 Hebron Avenue Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 07 /
REECE, Steven Y. 105 Henry Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 08 /
TYAGI, Nitin 491 Northlake Drive San Jose, CA 95117 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 19155139.9 | 24.07.2013 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US201261739538P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739538 P | US201261676473P | 27.07.2012 Original published format: US 201261676473 P | US201313796004 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US201313796004 | US201261683260P | 15.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261683260 P | US201313795878 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US201313795878 | US201313948497 | 13.07.2013 Original published format: US201313948497 | US201261738546P | 18.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261738546 P | US201261739140P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739140 P | US201261739145P | 19.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261739145 P | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502057 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01C3/12, H01M8/18, // H01M8/1053, H01M8/1041, H01M8/1018 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,KR);
H01M8/1053 (EP,KR);
H01M8/1055 (EP,KR);
H01M2008/1095 (EP);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN MIT OPTIMALEN MEMBRANSYSTEMEN | [2019/26] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FEATURING OPTIMAL MEMBRANE SYSTEMS | [2019/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE COMPORTANT DES SYSTÈMES DE MEMBRANE OPTIMAUX | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 17.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13823245.9 / EP2878026 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4362791 (KANEKO HIROKO, et al) [Y] 1,4-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 57 - line 60 * * column 6, line 22 * * examples 6,7 *; | [Y]WO9512219 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 16, line 32 - page 102, line 36 * * pages 18,21-23 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 5 * * page 15, line 17 - line 23 * * page 105, line 24 - line 39 *; | [Y]US2012052347 (WILSON GREGORY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] , [0074] , [0125] *; | [Y] - PUIKI LEUNG ET AL, "Progress in redox flow batteries, remaining challenges and their applications in energy storage", RSC ADVANCES, UK, (20120101), vol. 2, no. 27, doi:10.1039/c2ra21342g, ISSN 2046-2069, page 10125, XP055260653 [Y] 1-14 * page 10144 - page 10145; table 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2ra21342g | by applicant | - DAVIES , J. A.; DUTRAMEZ, S., J. Am. Ceram. Soc., (19900000), vol. 73, pages 2570 - 2572 | - BORGIAS, B. A.; COOPER, S. R.; KOH, Y. B.; RAYMOND, K. N., Inorg. Chern., (19840000), vol. 23, pages 1009 - 1016 | - RAYMOND, K. N.; ISIED, S.S.; BROWN, L. D.; FRONCZEK, F. R.; NIBERT, J. H., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19760000), vol. 98, pages 1767 - 1774 |