EP3524321 - METHODS TO OPTIMIZE COVERAGE FOR MULTIPLE TARGETS SIMULTANEOUSLY FOR RADIATION TREATMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems International AG Hinterbergstrasse 14 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2019/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUUSELA, Esa Reivikuja 3 B 5 02320 ESPOO / FI | 02 /
RUOKOKOSKI, Emmi Takomotie 14 D 38 00380 HELSINKI / FI | 03 /
OLLILA, Santtu Mannerheimintie 59 B 41 00250 HELSINKI / FI | 04 /
NORD, Janne Alilahde 11 02620 ESPOO / FI | 05 /
PELTOLA, Jarkko Poutakuja 1 M 04300 TUUSULA, SUOMI / FI | [2019/33] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19155371.8 | 04.02.2019 | [2019/33] | Priority number, date | US201815890051 | 06.02.2018 Original published format: US201815890051 | [2019/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3524321 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3524321 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2019/33] | CPC: |
A61N5/1036 (EP,US);
A61N5/1031 (CN,US);
A61N5/1045 (US);
A61N5/1047 (EP,US);
A61N5/1069 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] |
Former [2019/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHZEITIGEN OPTIMIERUNG DER ABDECKUNG MEHRERER ZIELE FÜR STRAHLENBEHANDLUNGEN | [2019/33] | English: | METHODS TO OPTIMIZE COVERAGE FOR MULTIPLE TARGETS SIMULTANEOUSLY FOR RADIATION TREATMENTS | [2019/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR OPTIMISER LA COUVERTURE SIMULTANÉE DE PLUSIEURS CIBLES POUR DES TRAITEMENTS PAR RAYONNEMENT | [2019/33] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 21.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2019 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | IT | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016144201 (SCHULTE REINHARD W [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0008] , [0044] , [0058] , [0059] , [0062] - [0064] - [0068] , [0087] , [0093] , [0094] , [0097] , [0098] , [0101] - [0105] *; | [A]US2017014642 (AN YU [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0036] - [0040] *; | [A] - SCHLAEFER A ET AL, "Stepwise multi-criteria optimization for robotic radiosurgery", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20080428), vol. 35, no. 5, doi:10.1118/1.2900716, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 2094 - 2103, XP012116071 [A] 1-15 * column 6 - column 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.2900716 |