EP3692883 - DUST SUCTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPLACING A FILTER ELEMENT IN A DUST SUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohlendorf, Oliver Edith-Stein-Straße 9 A 86899 Landsberg / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 19155482.3 | 05.02.2019 | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692883 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/12, A47L5/36, A47L9/22 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A47L9/122 (EP,US);
A47L5/365 (EP,US);
A47L9/10 (US);
A47L9/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBABSAUGVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM WECHSELN EINES FILTERELEMENTES IN EINER STAUBABSAUGVORRICHTUNG | [2020/33] | English: | DUST SUCTION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR REPLACING A FILTER ELEMENT IN A DUST SUCTION DEVICE | [2020/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ASPIRATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHANGEMENT D'UN ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT DANS UN DISPOSITIF ASPIRATEUR | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9835602 (ELECTROLUX ABP [SE], et al) [X] 1-5* page 3, lines 1-33; figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [X]JP2001054496 (MAKITA CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |