EP3502913 - BACKUP INFORMATION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMC Corporation 6801 Koll Center Parkway Pleasanton CA 94566 / US | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSHWAH, Ajay Pratap Singh 50 Cedar Pointe Loop 408 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
KAUSHIK, Akhil 1063 Morse Ave., 20-200 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
XING, Jian Jack 4817 Wexler Peak Way Antioch, CA 94531 / US | 04 /
JOSHI, Mayank 900 Pepper Tree Lane, Apt. 226 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Pashupati 1412 Lakeshore Circle, Building 36 San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 06 /
PERIYAGARAM, Subramanian 1063 Morse Avenue, 4-306 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 07 /
SURYANARAYANAN, Rangarajan 328 Market St. Los Gatos, CA 95032-1556 / US | 08 /
BIJANI, Yogita 328 Market St. Los Gatos, CA 95032-1556 / US | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Turp, Sarah Ann WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19155582.0 | 19.12.2005 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | US200464097104P | 31.12.2004 Original published format: US 64097104 P | US20058417905 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 8417905 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3502913 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3502913 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502913 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14, G06F16/10, G06F16/11 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06F16/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/1471 (EP,US);
G06F16/11 (EP,US);
G06F11/1458 (EP,US);
G06F2201/84 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | G06F16/11 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/04] |
Former [2019/26] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON SICHERUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2019/26] | English: | BACKUP INFORMATION MANAGEMENT | [2019/26] | French: | GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE SECOURS | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05854771.2 / EP1839202 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003093620 (HUXOLL VERNON F [US]) [X] 1,3-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062] * * claims 7,9,10 * [A] 2; | [A]US2004107199 (DALRYMPLE PHILIP W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2004261070 (MILLER BRENT ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0025] * * figure 2 ** claim 1 * | Examination | US2003115547 | by applicant | - PETER J. VARMAN; RAKESH M. VERMA, "An Efficient Multiversion Access Structure", IEEE Transactions on Knowledge and Data Engineering, (19970500), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 391 - 409 |