EP3693243 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AN AUTOMATED DRIVING SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zenuity AB Lindholmspiren 2 417 56 Göteborg / SE | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAM, Tommy Gustaf Dalénsgatan 6 417 22 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
JANSSON, Anton Solventilsgatan 7 417 23 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
GRÖNBERG, Robin Hällskriftsgatan 5 417 26 Göteborg / SE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19155773.5 | 06.02.2019 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693243 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, // B60W50/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
G05D1/0236 (CN);
B60W50/085 (US);
G05D1/0221 (CN);
G05D1/0223 (CN);
G05D1/0251 (CN);
G05D1/0257 (CN);
G05D1/0278 (CN);
G05D1/0285 (CN);
G06F18/2178 (US);
B60W2050/0013 (EP);
B60W2050/0014 (US);
B60W2050/0022 (EP);
B60W2050/0028 (EP);
B60W2050/0067 (EP);
B60W2050/0088 (EP);
B60W2540/043 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (US);
B60W2540/12 (US);
B60W2540/21 (US);
B60W2540/215 (EP);
B60W2540/225 (US);
B60W2552/10 (US);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
B60W2554/402 (US);
B60W2554/404 (US);
B60W2554/80 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AUTOMATISIERTEN FAHRSYSTEMS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING AN AUTOMATED DRIVING SYSTEM OF A VEHICLE | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE CONDUITE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 27.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018139993 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 ** the whole document *; | [X]US2018229723 (JIANG ZHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] * * paragraph [0026] * * the whole document * |