EP3528187 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT AND PROVIDING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TKR Spezialwerkzeuge GmbH Am Waldesrand 9 - 11 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreischer, Torsten Auf der Egge 78 58300 Wetter / DE | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/34] | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | Application number, filing date | 19155794.1 | 06.02.2019 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | DE201810103449 | 15.02.2018 Original published format: DE102018103449 | [2019/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3528187 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06F16/50 (US);
G06F18/211 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06V20/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION EINES GEGENSTANDES UND BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN | [2019/34] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING AN OBJECT AND PROVIDING INFORMATION | [2019/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UN OBJET ET DE FOURNITURE DES INFORMATIONS | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 12.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/32] | 02.07.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2021 | 03.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005198095 (DU KAVIN [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "Feature extraction - Wikipedia", (20171213), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Feature_extraction&oldid=815172925, (20190313), XP055568302 [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 3 * |