EP3694122 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT UTILIZATION OF A TRANSPORT CAPACITY PROVIDED BY AN OPTICAL TRANSPORT NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adtran Networks SE Märzenquelle 1-3 98617 Meiningen / DE | [2023/42] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states ADVA Optical Networking SE Märzenquelle 1 - 3 98617 Meiningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleck, Oliver Watzmannweg 32 82538 Geretstried / DE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/33] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19156006.9 | 07.02.2019 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694122 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3694122 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H04J3/1652 (EP);
H04J14/0227 (US);
H04B10/25 (US);
H04B10/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EFFIZIENTEN NUTZUNG EINER VON EINEM OPTISCHEN TRANSPORTNETZ BEREITGESTELLTEN TRANSPORTKAPAZITÄT | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EFFICIENT UTILIZATION OF A TRANSPORT CAPACITY PROVIDED BY AN OPTICAL TRANSPORT NETWORK | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'UTILISATION EFFICACE D'UNE CAPACITÉ DE TRANSPORT FOURNIE PAR UN RÉSEAU DE TRANSPORT OPTIQUE | [2020/33] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010121520 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract ** figures 1-4e *; | [XI]US2012269511 (CALDERON JUAN-CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0059]; figures 2, 3A-3D, 4 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0105]; figures 8,9 * [I] 5-7,9-14; | [XI]EP2775638 (ALTERA CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 5-7,9-14; | [I]EP2852177 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0095]; figures 9,10 *; | [X]EP2991252 (CIENA CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] * |