Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
24.06.2020 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.09.2019 | Publication of search report | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
27.09.2019 | Change - classification | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
19.07.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
09.02.2019 | Change - representative |