EP3696558 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC TESTING OF A SWITCHING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schierling, Hubert Pommernstr. 18 G 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2020/34] | Application number, filing date | 19157462.3 | 15.02.2019 | [2020/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3696558 | Date: | 19.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, G01R31/26 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
G01R31/3275 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/2621 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/2608 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/318357 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN PRÜFUNG EINES SCHALTORGANS | [2020/34] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC TESTING OF A SWITCHING BODY | [2020/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN ORGANE DE COMMUTATION | [2020/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009212975 (AUSMAN MARC [US], et al); | [XI]DE102015204343 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | [XI]DE102015222990 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [X]US2017187367 (RÄTZ MARKUS [CH]) |