EP3530162 - RASP AND CORRESPONDING RASP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMF Group GmbH Eberhardstrasse 35 73312 Geislingen/Steige / DE | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHN, Manuel Hintere Schmiedgasse 12/1 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/35] | Application number, filing date | 19157465.6 | 15.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | DE201810104420 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: DE102018104420 | [2019/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530162 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/25 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A47J43/25 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIBE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE REIBEEINRICHTUNG | [2019/35] | English: | RASP AND CORRESPONDING RASP DEVICE | [2019/35] | French: | RÂPE ET AGENCEMENT DE RÂPAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO2012099646 (VIOLINA SYNDICATE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11 * figures 1-5; claims 1, 9 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * page 5, line 6 - line 17 * * the whole document * [A] 5,6,12,13 [Y] 10,14; | [XA]US2015272396 (SMITH JASON DWAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,13 * figures 1-4, 7, 8, 12A * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * the whole document * [A] 2,5-8,10-12,14; | [XAI]WO2017015635 (WEIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,12 * figures 1-3; claims 2, 10 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [00025] * * paragraph [00036] * * paragraph [00055] - paragraph [00056] * * the whole document * [A] 3,4,7,9-11,13,14 [I] 5,6; | [YA]US2013220848 (SCHARF EITAM [US], et al) [Y] 14 * claims 1, 4 * * the whole document * [A] 1-13; | [YA]DE102011078701 (SILIT WERKE [DE]) [Y] 10 * claim 7 * * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11-14 |