EP3546549 - LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2022/45] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouno, Kunihiro Infineum Japan Ltd Japan Technology Center Yamato International Bldg. 4F, 5-1-1 Heiwajima, Ohta-ku Kanto, Tokyo 143-0006 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Shunsuke Infineum Japan Ltd Uchisaiwai-Cho Dai Building. 3F 1-3-3 Uchisaiwai-Cho Chiyoda-ku Kanto, Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Hart, Richard Joseph, et al PO Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [2019/40] | Application number, filing date | 19157843.4 | 18.02.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | EP20180164161 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: EP 18164161 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546549 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3546549 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C10M141/08 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
C10M141/08 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (CN,KR,US);
C10M133/44 (KR,US);
C10M125/22 (KR);
C10M125/26 (KR);
C10M129/08 (KR);
C10M129/16 (KR);
C10M129/54 (US);
C10M133/06 (KR);
C10M133/08 (US);
C10M135/16 (KR);
C10M135/18 (US);
C10M137/10 (US);
C10M137/105 (KR);
C10M141/12 (EP,US);
C10M2201/066 (KR);
C10M2207/144 (US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2223/045 (US);
C10N2010/04 (US);
C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10N2020/02 (US);
C10N2030/04 (KR,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10N2030/10 (KR);
C10N2030/12 (KR,US);
C10N2030/54 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C10M2219/066, C10N2010/12 (EP,US);
C10M2219/068, C10N2010/12 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/40] | English: | LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION | [2019/40] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HUILE DE LUBRIFICATION | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 23.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2022 | 04.07.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.11.2022 | AT | 09.11.2022 | CZ | 09.11.2022 | DK | 09.11.2022 | EE | 09.11.2022 | ES | 09.11.2022 | FI | 09.11.2022 | HR | 09.11.2022 | LT | 09.11.2022 | LV | 09.11.2022 | MC | 09.11.2022 | PL | 09.11.2022 | RO | 09.11.2022 | RS | 09.11.2022 | SE | 09.11.2022 | SI | 09.11.2022 | SK | 09.11.2022 | SM | 09.11.2022 | NO | 09.02.2023 | GR | 10.02.2023 | IE | 18.02.2023 | LU | 18.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | IS | 09.03.2023 | PT | 09.03.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SI | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
LU | 18.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
LU | 18.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
MC | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SK | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 09.11.2022 | |
AT | 09.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
CZ | 09.11.2022 | ||
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RO | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
EE | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
DK | 09.11.2022 | ||
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
SM | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
HR | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
PL | 09.11.2022 | ||
RS | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
IS | 09.03.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
LV | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
GR | 10.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 09.11.2022 | |
ES | 09.11.2022 | ||
FI | 09.11.2022 | ||
LT | 09.11.2022 | ||
SE | 09.11.2022 | ||
NO | 09.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 09.11.2022 | |
NO | 09.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6143701 (BOFFA ALEXANDER B [US]) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 13 - line 14; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1364955 (INDIAN OIL CORP LTD [IN]) [Y] 9,10* claim 26 *; | [XAYI]WO2011161982 (JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-13 * examples 2, comparative examples 3/4; claim 1 * [A] 14,15 [Y] 6,8-10 [I] 4,16,17; | [Y]US2012028862 (JEONG DO-KON [KR], et al) [Y] 8 * table 1 * | by applicant | US3087936 | GB989409 | US3254025 | US4102798 | US4113639 | US4116876 | US4152499 | US4234435 | EP0208560 | US4857217 | EP0330522 | US4927551 | US4938881 | US4938880 | US4952739 | US4956107 | US4963275 | US5053152 | US5229022 | US5230714 | US5241003 | US5430105 | US5565128 | US5756431 | US5792730 | US5854186 |