EP3527278 - FILTRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diasa Industrial, S.A. Pol. Ind. Azucarera, S/N 26500 Calahorra / ES | [2019/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACIAS GALLEGO, Carlos DIASA INDUSTRIAL, S.A. POL. IND. AZUCARERA, S/N 26500 CALAHORRA (LA RIOJA) / ES | [2019/34] | Representative(s) | Maslanka Kubik, Dorota Irena C/Vara de Rey 5 TER, 3, Oficina 5 26003 Logroño (La Rioja) / ES | [2019/34] | Application number, filing date | 19157952.3 | 19.02.2019 | [2019/34] | Priority number, date | ES20180030213U | 19.02.2018 Original published format: ES 201830213 U | [2019/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3527278 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/02, B01D24/14, B01D29/41, B01D29/58, C02F1/00, C02F1/28, E04H4/12, // C02F103/42 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
C02F1/004 (EP);
B01D24/14 (EP);
B01D29/416 (EP);
B01D29/58 (EP);
B01D35/02 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F2103/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTRIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/34] | English: | FILTRATION DEVICE | [2019/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION | [2019/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0616768 (NISSO IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-7 * * column 2, line 51 - column 6, line 5 * [A] 3,4,7 [I] 2,5,6,8-11; | [XAI]DE19806924 (WTS KERESKEDELMI ES SZOLGALTAT [HU]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 53 * [A] 3,4,7 [I] 2,5,6,8-11; | [A]US6024870 (THOMPSON EUGENE R [US]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-5 ** column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A]US2005061747 (BOWERS ROY LAWSON [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0037] * |