Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3556863 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2014346695 CA2929547 CN201480066318 EP14860878 EP19158290 JP2016552481 JP2019212462 JP2022003920 JP2023000938 KR20167014700

More

US2014064327W US201415035205 US201715818669 US202016745781



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2020247879Global Dossier 06.08.2020A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201615035205 06.05.2016
US201715818669 20.11.2017
US202016745781 17.01.2020
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9822172Global Dossier 21.11.2017B2
US2016289308 06.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201415035205 06.11.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10562961Global Dossier 18.02.2020B2
US2018066045 08.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201615035205 06.05.2016
US201715818669 20.11.2017
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102404285BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2022B1
KR20160068988 15.06.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2023052239Global Dossier 11.04.2023A
Priority number Date
JP2022003920 13.01.2022
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7277623BGlobal Dossier 19.05.2023B2
JP2022068143 09.05.2022A
Priority number Date
JP2019212462 25.11.2019
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017501211Global Dossier 12.01.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3066221Global Dossier 20.09.2017A4
EP3066221 14.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105793439BGlobal Dossier 04.09.2020B
CN105793439 20.07.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2929547Global Dossier 28.02.2023C
CA2929547 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2014346695BGlobal Dossier 15.10.2020B2
AU2014346695 16.06.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3556863Global Dossier 18.09.2024B1
EP3556863 23.10.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
EP14860878 06.11.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112016010106 05.12.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3185700 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361900942 06.11.2013
CA2929547 06.11.2014
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201690731 31.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1221490 02.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX375701 06.03.2025B
MX2016005834 17.11.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US64327 06.11.2014
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015069880Global Dossier 14.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2020048569Global Dossier 02.04.2020A
Priority number Date
US201361900942 06.11.2013
US201462054324 23.09.2014
US201462064380 15.10.2014
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3066221