EP3531360 - CONTEXT-BASED USER ASSISTANCE AND SERVICE WORKSPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states Servicenow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASEEN, Rahim M. c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
FROGNER, Sean K. c/o ServiceNow, Inc. 2225 Lawson Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | McCann, Heather Alison, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19158649.4 | 21.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | US201815905215 | 26.02.2018 Original published format: US201815905215 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3531360 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
G06Q30/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
H04L51/02 (US);
H04L67/535 (US);
G06F16/27 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTEXTBASIERTE BENUTZERASSISTENZ UND SERVICE-ARBEITSBEREICH | [2019/35] | English: | CONTEXT-BASED USER ASSISTANCE AND SERVICE WORKSPACE | [2019/35] | French: | ESPACE DE TRAVAIL D'ASSISTANCE UTILISATEUR ET DE SERVICE BASÉ SUR LE CONTEXTE | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2022 | 21.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/10] | 30.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018013699 (SAPOZNIK GUSTAVO [US], et al) [X] 1,10,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0450] *[I] 2-9,11-14 |