EP3530295 - DEMINERALIZED BONE MATRIX HAVING IMPROVED HANDLING CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc. 2500 Silveus Crossing Warsaw, IN 46582 / US | [2019/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALPAKCI, Kerem N. 4165 Barfield Road Memphis, TN Tennessee 38117 / US | 02 /
SHIMKO, Daniel A. 8054 Bobwood Drive Germantown, TN Tennessee 38138 / US | [2019/35] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [2024/31] |
Former [2019/35] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19158863.1 | 22.02.2019 | [2019/35] | Priority number, date | US201815902038 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: US201815902038 | [2019/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3530295 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3530295 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/48 | [2019/35] | CPC: |
A61L27/48 (EP,US);
A61L27/3608 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61L27/20 (CN,KR,US);
A61F2/28 (KR);
A61L27/12 (US);
A61L27/14 (US);
A61L27/365 (CN,KR);
A61L27/50 (US);
A61L27/54 (KR,US);
A61L27/58 (US);
A61F2002/2835 (KR);
A61L2400/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/20, C08L5/04 (CN);
A61L27/48, C08L5/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/14] |
Former [2019/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENTMINERALISIERTE KNOCHENMATRIX MIT VERBESSERTEN HANDHABUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2019/35] | English: | DEMINERALIZED BONE MATRIX HAVING IMPROVED HANDLING CHARACTERISTICS | [2019/35] | French: | MATRICE OSSEUSE DÉMINÉRALISÉE PRÉSENTANT DE MEILLEURES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE MANIPULATION | [2019/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/14] | 25.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008152691 (DRAPEAU SUSAN J [US], et al); | [XI]WO2008157495 (OSTEOTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]US7582309 (ROSENBERG ARON D [US], et al) | by applicant | US4294753 | US4877864 | US5013649 | US5106748 | US5108922 | US5116738 | WO9300432 | US5187076 | US5366875 | WO9426893 | WO9426892 |