EP3699838 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO DATA OF ASSETS IN A FACILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELLE, Sven Berliner-Platz 12a 90489 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
VESPER, Ulf Brüsseler Weg 9 91325 Adelsdorf / DE | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19159054.6 | 25.02.2019 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699838 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DES ZUGRIFFS AUF DATEN VON ASSETS IN EINER ANLAGE | [2020/35] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING ACCESS TO DATA OF ASSETS IN A FACILITY | [2020/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA FOURNITURE D'ACCÈS AUX DONNÉES D'ACTIFS DANS UNE INSTALLATION | [2020/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/31] | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2801935 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0109] *; | [I]US2018292983 (NOR RANEATH OMEGA [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] ** paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035] * |