EP3561229 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT WITH PLATFORM COVER PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Corey D. 49 Birchwood Road East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06118 / US | 02 /
SPANGLER, Brandon W. 25 Valerie Drive Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/44] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19159160.1 | 25.02.2019 | [2019/44] | Priority number, date | US201815961930 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US201815961930 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3561229 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3561229 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D9/04 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP);
F01D5/188 (US);
F01D9/041 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
F05D2240/81 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2019/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTORKOMPONENTE MIT PLATTFORMABDECKPLATTE | [2020/26] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE COMPONENT WITH PLATFORM COVER PLATE | [2019/44] | French: | COMPOSANTE DE MOTEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ AVEC PLAQUE DE COUVERCLE DE PLATEFORME | [2019/44] |
Former [2019/44] | GASTURBINENMOTORKOMPONENTE MIT PLATTFORMABDECKUNGSPLATTE | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 17.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2019 | AL | 04.11.2020 | AT | 04.11.2020 | CY | 04.11.2020 | CZ | 04.11.2020 | DK | 04.11.2020 | EE | 04.11.2020 | ES | 04.11.2020 | FI | 04.11.2020 | HR | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | LT | 04.11.2020 | LV | 04.11.2020 | MC | 04.11.2020 | MK | 04.11.2020 | MT | 04.11.2020 | NL | 04.11.2020 | PL | 04.11.2020 | RO | 04.11.2020 | RS | 04.11.2020 | SE | 04.11.2020 | SI | 04.11.2020 | SK | 04.11.2020 | SM | 04.11.2020 | TR | 04.11.2020 | BG | 04.02.2021 | NO | 04.02.2021 | GR | 05.02.2021 | IE | 25.02.2021 | LU | 25.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | IS | 04.03.2021 | PT | 04.03.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.02.2019 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
TR | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 25.02.2019 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
MK | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.02.2019 | |
AL | 04.11.2020 | ||
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CY | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SI | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
NL | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 04.11.2020 | |
AT | 04.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
MC | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
DK | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
EE | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
CZ | 04.11.2020 | ||
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RO | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SK | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LT | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
SM | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
HR | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
ES | 04.11.2020 | ||
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
PL | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
IS | 04.03.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 04.11.2020 | |
FI | 04.11.2020 | ||
LV | 04.11.2020 | ||
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
SE | 04.11.2020 | ||
BG | 04.02.2021 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
GR | 05.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
RS | 04.11.2020 | ||
NO | 04.02.2021 | ||
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 04.11.2020 | |
PT | 04.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2628807 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-15 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 7 *; | [A]US5634766 (CUNHA FRANCISCO J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 11, lines 35-52; figures 6, 13 *; | [A]EP1808575 (SIEMENS POWER GENERATION INC [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0019]; figure 4 *; | [A]CH700687 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP1808575 | EP3495613 |