Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
18.06.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.01.2022 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.12.2021 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.12.2021 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | |
15.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2020 | New entry: Observations by third parties | |
22.05.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.05.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
22.05.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
19.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.10.2019 | Publication of search report | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
18.10.2019 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
16.08.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
26.02.2019 | Change - representative |