Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11180951 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | B2 | US2019264499 | 29.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | US201916266807 | 04.02.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190103026 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110195565B | Global Dossier | 15.12.2023 | B | CN110195565 | 03.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3034360 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019201298 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3540171 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2019 | A3 | EP3540171 | 18.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI806969B | 01.07.2023 | B | TW201936099 | 16.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862635190 | 26.02.2018 |