EP3550793 - NETWORK APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Sejung 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SEO, Daewon 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
YU, Bongsung 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 19159267.4 | 26.02.2019 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | KR20180040002 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180040002 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550793 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550793 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/08 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H04L63/102 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0869 (KR);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/41] | English: | NETWORK APPARATUS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2019/41] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉSEAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2019 | AL | 19.01.2022 | AT | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | MK | 19.01.2022 | NL | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | RS | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | SM | 19.01.2022 | IE | 26.02.2022 | LU | 26.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | FR | 19.03.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
FR | 19.03.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 19.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011010542 (CHOI HYOK-SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,9-11,13 * paragraphs [0018] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0134] * [I] 2,4-8,12,14,15; | [A]EP2747374 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * paragraph [0010] ** paragraphs [0016] - [0017] *; | [A]US9723003 (MCCLINTOCK JON ARRON [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, lines 3-53 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 26 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 3 * * column 11, line 14 - column 14, line 67 * * column 16, line 45 - column 17, line 50 * * column 20, lines 16-51 * |