EP3703192 - TERMINAL ADAPTER FOR AN ELECTRICAL BUSHING, ELECTRICAL BUSHING HAVING SAID TERMINAL ADAPTER, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/03] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czyzewski, Jan ul. Bazanki 8 30-376 Krakow / PL | 02 /
Maurer, Victoria Burgunderstrasse 26 4500 Solothurn / CH | 03 /
Graas, Fredrik Brown Boveri Str. 6 5400 Baden / CH | 04 /
Sjoberg, Peter Anisstigen 9 771 43 Ludvika / SE | 05 /
Kutorasinski, Kamil Brown Boveri Str. 6 5400 Baden / CH | 06 /
Gloor, Marco Brown Boveri Str. 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159410.0 | 26.02.2019 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703192 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/53, H01F27/04, H02G15/064 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H01R13/53 (EP);
H02G15/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] |
Former [2020/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSADAPTER FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE BUCHSE, ELEKTRISCHE BUCHSE MIT BESAGTEM ANSCHLUSSADAPTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DAVON | [2020/36] | English: | TERMINAL ADAPTER FOR AN ELECTRICAL BUSHING, ELECTRICAL BUSHING HAVING SAID TERMINAL ADAPTER, AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING THEREOF | [2020/36] | French: | ADAPTATEUR TERMINAL POUR TRAVERSÉE ÉLECTRIQUE, TRAVERSÉE ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ DUDIT ADAPTATEUR TERMINAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE CORRESPONDANT | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 11.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH469327 (BOREL & CIE EXPL CABL EL SYST [CH]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]US4059722 (ADLER HORST, et al) [X] 1,2,7,13-15 * column 5, lines 4-20 figure 2 * [Y] 4-6 [I] 3,8-12; | [A]EP0683555 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012108112 (VERNICA MIKE [US]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figures 2b, 3c *; | [A]EP3032673 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3172800 (TYCO ELECTRONICS (SHANGHAI) CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |