EP3537111 - TIMING MARKERS FOR FIBER SENSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kidde Technologies, Inc. 4200 Airport Drive, NW Wilson, NC 27896 / US | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Mark Sherwood 17587 Heidelberg Way Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/37] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19159526.3 | 26.02.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | US201815913696 | 06.03.2018 Original published format: US201815913696 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537111 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3537111 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353, G01K1/02, G01K11/32, G01K11/3206, // G01D18/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G01D5/35316 (EP,US);
G01D5/35303 (US);
G01B11/165 (US);
G01K1/026 (EP,US);
G01K11/32 (EP,US);
G01K11/3206 (EP,US);
G01L1/246 (US);
G01M11/3127 (US);
G01M11/3136 (US);
G02B6/02042 (US);
B64D2045/0085 (US);
B64D2045/009 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | G01D5/353, G01K11/32, // G01D18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TIMING-MARKER FÜR FASERMESSSYSTEME | [2019/37] | English: | TIMING MARKERS FOR FIBER SENSING SYSTEMS | [2019/37] | French: | MARQUEURS DE SYNCHRONISATION POUR SYSTÈMES DE DÉTECTION DE FIBRES | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 18.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | BG | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/45] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2007051882 (CHILDERS BROOKS [US]) [I] 1,2,4,6-11,13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1,2a,2b * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * [Y] 3,5,12,14,15; | [I]US2009072981 (POWELL BRIAN DAVID [GB]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 1-5c *; | [A]US2015036134 (SAITOH TAKANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075] ** figures 1-8 *; | [Y]EP3246682 (KIDDE TECH INC [US]) [Y] 3,5,12,14,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0057] * * figures 2A-2D * |