EP3627598 - ACTIVE MATERIAL, ELECTRODE, SECONDARY BATTERY, BATERRY PACK AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Yasuhiro c/o Toshiba Corp.(K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Takami, Norio c/o Toshiba Corp.(K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Hoshina, Keigo c/o Toshiba Corp.(K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Yoshima, Kazuomi c/o Toshiba Corp.(K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 19159665.9 | 27.02.2019 | [2020/13] | Priority number, date | JP20180173405 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018173405 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627598 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/485, // H01M4/131, H01M4/02 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/362 (CN);
B60K6/28 (US);
B60L50/64 (US);
B60L53/53 (CN);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/38 (CN);
H01M4/48 (CN);
H01M4/483 (US);
H01M4/485 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/5825 (CN);
H01M50/204 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,CN,US);
B60Y2200/91 (US);
B60Y2200/92 (US);
B60Y2400/112 (US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVMATERIAL, ELEKTRODE, SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BATTERIEPACK UND FAHRZEUG | [2020/13] | English: | ACTIVE MATERIAL, ELECTRODE, SECONDARY BATTERY, BATERRY PACK AND VEHICLE | [2020/13] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF, ÉLECTRODE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, BLOC-BATTERIE ET VÉHICULE | [2020/13] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 23.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3070056 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-13 * abstract * * comparative examples 8 and 10 * * claims 10-12 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0040] , [ 0161] *; | [X]US2017077504 (ISE KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * claims 1, 5, 10-15 * * paragraphs [0040] , [ 0044] , [ 0060] - [0064] - [ 0163] , [ 0285] *; | [X]US10056615 (ISE KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * abstract * * comparative examples 2 and 3 * * claims 4-6 * * column 1, lines 24-37 * * column 2, lines 53-62 ** column 3, lines 54-62 * | by applicant | - Journal of Solid-State Chemistry, (19840000), vol. 53, pages 144 - 147 |