EP3534249 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jin Su c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SON, Chae Joo c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Do Sung c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
HONG, Sae Rom c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LEE, Min Hee c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
LIM, Ji Hye c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2019/36] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2019/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159777.2 | 27.02.2019 | [2019/36] | Priority number, date | KR20180024521 | 28.02.2018 Original published format: KR 20180024521 | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3534249 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3534249 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H01R12/72, H01R13/62, E04F13/08 | [2019/36] | CPC: |
G06F3/1446 (EP,KR,US);
G09F9/3026 (KR);
G02F1/13336 (KR);
H01R13/10 (US);
H01R31/06 (EP,US);
G09G2300/026 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/621 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/36] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2019/36] | French: | AFFICHEUR | [2019/36] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005116667 (MUELLER GEORGE G [US], et al) [A] 1-8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0228] *; | [A]WO2009069076 (RAMAIOLI FRANCESCO [IT]) [A] 1-8,13,14 * abstract * * page 8, line 27 - line 29 * * page 13, line 10 - line 12; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2009122325 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-8,13,14 * abstract ** page 6 - page 8; figures 1a-1c *; | [A]US2013181884 (PERKINS MICHAEL [CA], et al) [A] 1-8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0182]; figures 1-17 *; | [X]US2017220310 (HOCHMAN JEREMY [US]) [X] 1-8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-4,9-10 * |