EP3564564 - VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT COMPRISING A HOSE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/45] | HOSE ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT AND VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT | ||
[2023/40] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dometic Sweden AB Hemvärnsgatan 15 171 54 Solna / SE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Esch, Franz-Josef Schulkamp 66 48477 Hörstel / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Felix Christopher Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 19159821.8 | 27.02.2019 | [2019/45] | Priority number, date | DE201810206854 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018206854 | [2019/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3564564 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3564564 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/23, B60H1/00, // F16L57/06 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
F16L3/23 (EP);
B60H1/00557 (EP);
B60H1/00585 (EP);
F16L2201/20 (EP);
F16L57/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] |
Former [2019/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGENWARTUNGSEINHEIT UMFASSEND EINE SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG | [2023/40] | English: | VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT COMPRISING A HOSE ASSEMBLY | [2023/40] | French: | UNITÉ DE SERVICE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE DE TUYAU | [2023/40] |
Former [2019/45] | SCHLAUCHANORDNUNG FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGENWARTUNGSEINHEIT SOWIE FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGENWARTUNGSEINHEIT | ||
Former [2019/45] | HOSE ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT AND VEHICLE AIR CONDITION SERVICE UNIT | ||
Former [2019/45] | ENSEMBLE DE TUYAU POUR UNITÉ DE SERVICE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR DE VÉHICULE ET UNITÉ DE SERVICE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR VÉHICULE | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 06.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2708835 (NIGRO JOSEPH G); | [XI]US2708833 (NIGRO JOSEPH G); | [A]US2012318005 (LINGREY DAVID J [US], et al) | Examination | US2006130510 |