EP3536632 - INSULATION CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schumpeter GmbH Universitätsstrasse 2 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorsten, Michel In der Zeil 12 56355 Lautert / DE | 02 /
Wilts, Jelte Am Propsthof 142 53121 Bonn / DE | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19159919.0 | 28.02.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | DE20182001123U | 05.03.2018 Original published format: DE 202018001123 U | [2019/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3536632 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3536632 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/06, A47B3/06, A47B3/12, A47B13/08, A47B13/16, A47B37/04 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
A47B37/04 (EP);
A47B13/003 (EP);
A47B13/08 (EP);
A47B13/16 (EP);
A47B3/06 (EP);
A47B3/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/37] | B65D81/38, // F25D3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] |
Former [2019/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSBEHÄLTER | [2019/37] | English: | INSULATION CONTAINER | [2019/37] | French: | RÉCIPIENT ISOLÉ | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 07.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/04] | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5727857 (SMITH LORENA D [US]) [A] 14 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE202010011159U (DELTA T GES FUER MEDIZINTECHNIK MBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9,14,15 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE202016001018U (FRASSICA EUGENIO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,15 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2,3; claim 2 *; | [X]CN105600107 (BEIJING ROLOO COLD-CHAIN TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-4,14,15 * figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]DE202016104472U (ALPIRSBACHER KLOSTERBRÄU GLAUNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 14,15* figure - *; | [X]CN105972900 (SF EXPRESS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9,14,15 * figure 2 * |