EP3702126 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELASTIC AND FLEXIBLE FIBER WITH OPTICAL, ELECTRICAL OR MICROFLUIDIC FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Dresden Helmholtzstrasse 10 01069 Dresden / DE | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINEV, Ivan Hopfgartenstraße 16 01307 Dresden / DE | 02 /
AFANASENKAU, Dzmitry Heinrichstr. 6 01445 Radebeul / DE | 03 /
PAK, Anna Stralsunderstr. 14 13355 Berlin / DE | 04 /
ATHANASIADIS, Markos Schwepnitzer Strasse 8 01097 Dresden / DE | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159938.0 | 28.02.2019 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702126 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/05, B29C48/12, B29C64/106, B29C64/209, B33Y10/00, // B29C48/25, B29C48/02 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/02 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/266 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELASTISCHEN UND FLEXIBLEN FASER MIT OPTISCHER, ELEKTRISCHER ODER MIKROFLUIDISCHER FUNKTIONALITÄT | [2020/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELASTIC AND FLEXIBLE FIBER WITH OPTICAL, ELECTRICAL OR MICROFLUIDIC FUNCTIONALITY | [2020/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FIBRE ÉLASTIQUE ET FLEXIBLE AYANT UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ OPTIQUE, ÉLECTRIQUE OU MICROFLUIDIQUE | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2015073944 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [I] 1-6,8,13 * abstract * * claims 1-29 * * figures 1-14c *; | [XY]WO2016179242 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-93 * [Y] 8; | [I]US2018079139 (WANG FEIYUE [CN], et al) [I] 1-6,8,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * claims 1-25 ** figures 1-25 *; | [XY]WO2018183806 (DOW SILICONES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * claims 1-11 * * figures 1-6.6 * [Y] 8; | [E]WO2019112976 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [E] 1-6,8,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2017137945 | - J. A. LEWIS, Advanced Functional Materials, (20060000), vol. 16, page 2193 | - D. ESPINOSA-HOYOS et al., Scientific Reports, (20180000), vol. 8, page 478 | - A. SYDNEY GLADMAN et al., Nat Mater, (20160000), vol. 15, page 413 | - N. MATSUHISA et al., Nature Materials, (20170000), vol. 16, page 834 | - M. S. MANNOOR et al., Nano Letters, (20130000), vol. 13, page 2634 | - R. L. TRUBY et al., Advanced Materials, (20180000), vol. 30, page 1706383 | - J. T. MUTH et al., Advanced Materials, (20140000), vol. 26, page 6307 | - J. U. LIND et al., Nat Mater, (20170000), vol. 16, page 303 | - Z. ZHIJIE et al., Advanced Materials, vol. 0, page 1707495 | - A. CANALES et al., Nat Biotech, (20150000), vol. 33, page 277 | - K. KROLL et al., Progress in Biophysics and Molecular Biology, (20170000), vol. 130, page 212 | - A. D. VALENTINE T. A. et al., Advanced Materials, (20170000), vol. 29, page 1703817 | - L. XINYUE et al., Advanced Materials, (20180000), vol. 30, page 1704821 | - R. B. RAO et al., Advanced Materials, (20050000), vol. 17, page 289 | - H. YUK; X. ZHAO, Advanced Materials, (20180000), vol. 30, page 1704028 | - R. I. TANNE, Journal of Polymer Science Part A-2: Polymer Physics, (19700000), vol. 8, page 2067 | - D. A. CHANG-YEN et al., Lightwave Technol., (20050000), vol. 23, page 2088 | - A. ERSEN; M. SAHIN, Journal of biomedical optics, (20170000), vol. 22, page 055005 | - S. LEE et al., Materials Today, (20180000), vol. 21, page 207 | - H. BANSAL et al., Journal of Endourology, (20110000), vol. 25, page 317 | - K. M. KARKAR et al., Epilepsia, (20020000), vol. 43, page 932 | - H. KIDA et al., Clinical Neurophysiology, (20120000), vol. 123, page 1708 | - S. M. ROTHMAN, Neurotherapeutics, (20090000), vol. 6, page 251 | - S. M. ROTHMAN et al., Epilepsy & Behavior, (20050000), vol. 7, page 214 | - DRACK et al., Adv. Mater., (20150000), vol. 27, pages 34 - 40 | - VALENTINE et al., Adv. Mater., (20170000), vol. 29, page 1703817 | - GERRATT et al., Adv. Funct. Mater., (20150000), vol. 25, pages 2287 - 2295 | - WEHNER et al., Nature, vol. 536, page 451 |