EP3702014 - FILTER ELEMENT WITH BELLOWS RECESSED INTO EACH OTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLZ, Tobias Bensheimer Str. 36a 68519 Viernheim / DE | 02 /
SCHMITT, Thorsten Bildstockweg 16 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 19159946.3 | 28.02.2019 | [2020/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3702014 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/10, B01D46/52, B01D46/00 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
B01D46/10 (EP);
B01D46/521 (EP);
B01D46/522 (EP);
B01D46/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERELEMENT MIT INEINANDER EINTAUCHENDEN FALTENBÄLGEN | [2020/36] | English: | FILTER ELEMENT WITH BELLOWS RECESSED INTO EACH OTHER | [2020/36] | French: | ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT POURVU DE SOUFFLETS S'ENTRELAÇANT LES UNS ENTRE LES AUTRES | [2020/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1038568 (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1-8,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0016] *; | [XI]DE10349916 (B & S INDUSTRIESERVICE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,11-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] * [I] 10; | [X]DE19849477 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * abstract *; | [X]US2013174741 (KADDOUR STEPHANE [FR]) [X] 1,3,5,6,12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0026] - [0027] - [0040] - [0042] *; | [X]JPH10202036 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,11 * abstract * | by applicant | EP3015155 | EP2684591 |