Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.06.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
05.05.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.02.2022 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
02.02.2022 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
24.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2021 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
09.11.2020 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.04.2020 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.04.2020 | First examination report | |
13.03.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
13.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.03.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
13.03.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
09.08.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
01.05.2019 | Change - representative | |
02.03.2019 | Change - representative |