blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3537352

EP3537352 - ANALYTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.06.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2022Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.07.2022  [2022/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Escriche, Lorenzo
2630 Glendale-Milford Road
Brendamour Evendale Business Center
Evendale, OH Ohio 45241 / US
02 / TOLEDANO, David Sterling
1 Research Circle
Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US
03 / ABERNATHY, Charles Larry
-
deceased / US
04 / KLASING, Kevin Samuel
6380-6440 Aviation Way
West Chester, OH Ohio 45069 / US
05 / CARPENTER, John Sherrill
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US
06 / MALETTA, Paul Anthony
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US
07 / KINCAID, William Keith
6380-6440 Aviation Way
West Chester, OH Ohio 45069 / US
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date19160244.001.03.2019
[2019/37]
Priority number, dateUS201862640376P08.03.2018         Original published format: US 201862640376 P
US20181623515528.12.2018         Original published format: US201816235155
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537352
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2019
ClassificationIPC:G06Q10/06, G06Q10/00
[2019/37]
CPC:
G06Q10/06 (EP,US); G06Q10/06315 (US); G06F30/20 (CN);
G06N20/00 (US); G06Q10/00 (EP,US); G06Q10/04 (CN);
G06Q10/067 (US); G06Q10/103 (CN); G06F2119/04 (CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/16]
Former [2019/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANALYSEKERN UND AGGREGATION[2019/37]
English:ANALYTICS[2019/37]
French:NOYAU D'ANALYSE ET AGRÉGATION[2019/37]
Examination procedure11.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/16]
11.03.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.04.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2022Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2022
09.02.2022Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.02.2022Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/28]
06.03.2022Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.202204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US5455777  (FUJIYAMA KAZUNARI [JP], et al);
 [I]EP1508842  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]);
 [I]CN101950327B  (UNIV NORTHWESTERN POLYTECHNIC);
 [I]US2012173300  (DAVENPORT ANDREW J [US], et al);
 [I]WO2014043623  (SIEMENS CORP [US], et al);
 [I]US2016371584  (NICHOLAS BRAD [US], et al);
 [I]CN106503813  (UNIV TSINGHUA);
 [I]EP3171479  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]);
 [I]CN107358299  (PROCESS ASSET INTEGRATION & MAN LTD);
 [I]EP3260944  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]);
 [I]US2018060832  (KORSEDAL IV JOHN ROBERT [US], et al)
ExaminationEP3252723
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.