EP3511603 - RAPID-CONNECT COUPLER WITH VENT-STOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engineered Controls International, LLC 100 Rego Drive Elon, NC 27244 / US | [2024/25] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states Engineered Controls International, LLC 100 Rego Drive Elon, NC 27244 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONISHI, Howard 12530 135th Avenue NE Kirkland, Washington 98034 / US | [2019/29] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2019/29] | Application number, filing date | 19160487.5 | 21.03.2012 | [2019/29] | Priority number, date | US201161454696P | 21.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161454696 P | [2019/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3511603 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3511603 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/38, F16L37/086, F16L37/12, F16L37/36, F16L37/23, F16L55/07, F16L37/42 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
F16L37/36 (EP,US);
F16L37/08 (CN);
F16L37/42 (US);
F16L37/086 (CN);
F16L37/12 (EP,US);
F16L37/23 (EP,US);
F16L37/35 (EP,US);
F16L37/38 (CN);
F16L37/62 (CN);
F16L55/07 (US);
F17C2205/037 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELLVERBINDUNGSKOPPLER MIT ENTLÜFTUNGSANSCHLAG | [2019/29] | English: | RAPID-CONNECT COUPLER WITH VENT-STOP | [2019/29] | French: | COUPLEUR À RACCORD RAPIDE DOTÉ D'UN ARRÊT D'ÉVACUATION | [2019/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 13.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12759894.4 / EP2689177 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2904351 (ALFRED GELLETT CHARLES, et al); | [X]FR2063957 (MARIE JEAN); | [XI]EP0296282 (MHATRE HARISCHANDRA KESRINATH [IN], et al); | [X]US6343630 (DUBINSKY VICTOR [CA]); | [XI]EP2058576 (AGRAMKOW FLUID SYSTEMS AS [DK]); | [X]US2011005639 (WEH ERWIN [DE], et al) | by applicant | US5429155 | US6945477 |