EP3536196 - SALES REGISTRATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2019/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yajima, Shinsuke c/o IP Division Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2019/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/37] | Application number, filing date | 19160704.3 | 05.03.2019 | [2019/37] | Priority number, date | JP20180039067 | 05.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018039067 | [2019/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3536196 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47F9/04, G07G1/00 | [2019/37] | CPC: |
A47F9/046 (EP,US);
G07G1/0018 (US);
G07G1/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAUFSREGISTRIERUNGSGERÄT | [2019/37] | English: | SALES REGISTRATION APPARATUS | [2019/37] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT DES VENTES | [2019/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4963721 (KOHNO MITSUNORI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]US2009072039 (YAMADA YOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1* figures 1-6 *; | [Y]GB2535970 (NUMBER 8 TECH LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * figure 1 * |