EP3705885 - SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciosense B.V. High Tech Campus 10 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/37] | For all designated states ams AG Schloss Premstätten Tobelbader Str. 30 8141 Premstätten / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanhelmont, Frederik Willem Maurits Wurfelderweg 81 3680 MAASEIK / BE | 02 /
Nenadovic, Nebojsa De Gamert 2207 6605 WE WIJCHEN / NL | 03 /
Suy, Hilco Koolwitjelaan 18 5691 RN SON EN BREUGEL / NL | 04 /
Sakic, Agata Ekkerstraat 14 5616 SP EINDHOVEN / NL | 05 /
in't Zandt, Micha Opperstehei 15 5508 TX VELDHOVEN / NL | 06 /
Stefanuto, Guido Leenderweg 58 E 5615AB EINDHOVEN / NL | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 19161056.7 | 06.03.2019 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3705885 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/0031 (EP,US);
G01N27/123 (US);
G01D3/036 (EP);
G01N33/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SENSORVORRICHTUNG | [2020/37] | English: | SENSOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SENSOR DEVICE | [2020/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19642107 (AHLERS HORST DOZ DR ING HABIL [DE]); | [I]US5898101 (LYLE ROBERT P [US], et al); | [I]DE102005042485 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [XI]US2016169704 (BADEJA MICHAEL [DE], et al) |