EP3546708 - TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/40] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stretton, Richard c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19161474.2 | 08.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | GB20180005146 | 29.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201805146 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546708 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F02C7/20 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
F01D25/243 (EP);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
B64D29/06 (US);
F05D2230/60 (EP);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2019/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENANTRIEB | [2019/40] | English: | TURBINE ENGINE | [2019/40] | French: | MOTEUR DE TURBINE | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 14.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3095969 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,11 * column 6, paragraph 46 - column 7, paragraph 57; figures 1-3 * [I] 2; | [XI]US2014056702 (SIMONDS MARK E [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,9 * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 41; figures 1-4 * [I] 2; | [A]US5224341 (MUNROE ALAN D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 54; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0787895 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 51; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1857639 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, paragraph 21 - column 4, paragraph 24; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1921007 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 41 - column 6, line 45 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 1; figure 3A * |