Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10811628 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | B2 | US2020136084 | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102212888B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2021 | B1 | KR20200048000 | 08.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6698905B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B2 | JP2020072466 | 07.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110216890 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3646960 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | B1 | EP3646960 | 06.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN210059443U | 14.02.2020 | U | Priority number | Date | KR20180129584 | 29.10.2018 |