EP3520801 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BACTERIAL BLAUTIA STRAINS FOR TREATING VISCERAL HYPERSENSITIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4D PHARMA PLC 5th floor 9 Bond Court Leeds, LS1 2JZ / GB | [2019/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNALIER-DONADILLE, Annick 16 Impasse les Ormes 63670 La Roche Blanc / FR | 02 /
CROUZET, Laureen c/o 4D Pharma PLC Third Floor 9 Bond Court Leeds, LS1 2JZ / GB | 03 /
HABOUZIT, Chloe Rue Bertholet 63400 Chamalieres / FR | [2019/32] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19161713.3 | 06.03.2017 | [2019/32] | Priority number, date | GB20160012191 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: GB 201612191 | GB20160016022 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201616022 | GB20160003817 | 04.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603817 | [2019/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3520801 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/741, A61K9/00, A61P1/00 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
A61K35/741 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/74 (IL,KR,US);
A23C19/09 (CN);
A23C21/02 (CN);
A23C9/005 (CN);
A23C9/1203 (CN);
A23C9/152 (CN);
A23G9/363 (CN);
A23L33/135 (CN,KR);
A61K39/0208 (KR);
A61K47/02 (IL,US);
A61K47/10 (IL,US);
A61K47/12 (IL,US);
A61K47/26 (IL,US);
A61K47/36 (IL,US);
A61K47/38 (IL,US);
A61K47/42 (IL,US);
A61K9/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (KR);
A61K9/19 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/48 (IL,US);
A61K9/4891 (IL,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P1/04 (CN);
A61P1/14 (CN);
A61P29/00 (CN);
A23V2002/00 (CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/3204 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2019/32] | A61K35/741, A61K9/00, A61P1/14, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] |
Former [2019/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 07.02.2020 | ME | 07.02.2020 | Validation states | MA | 07.02.2020 | MD | 07.02.2020 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BAKTERIELLEN BLAUTIA-STÄMMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VISZERALER ÜBEREMPFINDLICHKEIT | [2019/32] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BACTERIAL BLAUTIA STRAINS FOR TREATING VISCERAL HYPERSENSITIVITY | [2019/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES SOUCHES BACTÉRIENNES DE BLAUTIA POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERSENSIBILITÉ VISCÉRALE | [2019/32] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 07.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/03] | 01.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17709911.6 / EP3313423 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO0185187 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al) [YD] 1-15 * see claims, pages 5-6, example 9 *; | [Y]WO2009154463 (STICHTING TOP INST FOOD AND NU [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * see claims, page 14 and examples *; | [Y] - 4DPharma, "4Dpharma PLC clinical update on Blautix(TM), a novel treatment fo irritable bowel syndrome", (20160119), 4DPharma, URL: http://www.directorstalkinterviews.com/4d-pharma-plc-clinical-update-on-blautix-a-novel-treatment-for-irritable-bowel-syndrome/412689588, (20170505), XP002769874 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - XU GUANG-YIN ET AL, "The endogenous hydrogen sulfide producing enzyme cystathionine-Î synthase contributes to visceral hypersensitivity in a rat model of irritable bowel syndrome", MOLECULAR PAIN, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20090806), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1744-8069-5-44, ISSN 1744-8069, page 44, XP021059779 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1744-8069-5-44 | [T] - DISTRUTTI ELEONORA ET AL, "Gut microbiota role in irritable bowel syndrome: New therapeutic strategies.", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY 21 FEB 2016, (20160221), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 2219-2840, pages 2219 - 2241, XP002769875 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3748/wjg.v22.i7.2219 |