EP3550723 - PAD TRACKING CIRCUIT FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE INPUT-TOLERANT OUTPUT BUFFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1st. Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yu-Jen No.1, Dusing 1st Rd., Hsinchu Science Park 30078 Hsinchu / TW | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2019/41] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19161849.5 | 11.03.2019 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | US201862651328P | 02.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862651328 P | US201916285213 | 26.02.2019 Original published format: US201916285213 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550723 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3550723 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/003 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
H03K19/00315 (EP,US);
H03K19/018507 (CN);
H03K19/018521 (US);
H03K17/6872 (US);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PADVERFOLGUNGSSCHALTUNG FÜR HOCHSPANNUNGSEINGANGSTOLERANTEN AUSGANGSPUFFER | [2019/41] | English: | PAD TRACKING CIRCUIT FOR HIGH-VOLTAGE INPUT-TOLERANT OUTPUT BUFFER | [2019/41] | French: | CIRCUIT DE SUIVI DE TAMPON POUR TAMPON DE SORTIE À TOLÉRANCE D'ENTRÉE HAUTE TENSION | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 03.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2003122606 (AJIT JANARDHANAN S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086]; figure 18 * [A] 7,10-12 [I] 6,13; | [Y]US2009002028 (KER MING-DOU [TW], et al) [Y] 12* figure 4 *; | [XAYI]US2010141324 (WANG CHUA-CHIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12 * figures 1,2 * [A] 11 [Y] 12 [I] 6,13; | [XAI]US2010176848 (DU YAMIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0052]; figures 3,4,6,7 * [A] 11 [I] 6,13 |