EP3517012 - BASE STATION FOR A VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [2019/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sernecki, Miron Fahrenbecke 38b 58097 Hagen / DE | 02 /
Starflinger, Frank Carolinenglückstraße 2a 44793 Bochum / DE | [2019/31] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/19] |
Former [2019/31] | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 19161904.8 | 01.12.2015 | [2019/31] | Priority number, date | DE201410119191 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: DE102014119191 | [2019/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3517012 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3517012 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/14, A47L9/20 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
A47L9/149 (EP);
A47L9/00 (CN);
A47L5/38 (CN);
A47L9/0063 (CN);
A47L9/20 (EP);
A47L2201/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BASISSTATION FÜR EINEN STAUBSAUGER | [2019/31] | English: | BASE STATION FOR A VACUUM CLEANER | [2019/31] | French: | STATION DE BASE POUR UN ASPIRATEUR | [2019/31] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 27.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15197176.9 / EP3033982 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2015 | CY | 11.05.2022 | MK | 11.05.2022 | MT | 11.05.2022 | TR | 11.05.2022 | AL | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | AT | 01.12.2022 | GB | 01.12.2022 | IE | 01.12.2022 | LU | 01.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
TR | 11.05.2022 | ||
AL | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
AT | 01.12.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
MK | 11.05.2022 | ||
AL | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
AT | 01.12.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
AL | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
AT | 01.12.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
CY | 11.05.2022 | ||
AL | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
IE | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 01.12.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 18.05.2022 | |
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 18.05.2022 | |
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1243218 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1-7* paragraphs [0020] - [0024] *; | [A]EP2407074 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0177] - [0182] * | Examination | ES2238196 | DE102008011723 | by applicant | EP1243218 |