Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3518115 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3518115



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 252
06.10.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.12.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
05.11.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.10.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.10.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.10.2020 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
14.10.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
14.10.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 27
03.09.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.09.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.09.2020 Claims Search / examination 2
03.09.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2020 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
15.05.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.05.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.05.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
15.05.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 27
04.03.2020 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.01.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
29.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
29.01.2020 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.01.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
29.01.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
29.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.08.2019 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
16.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.08.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.08.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
24.07.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
03.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
12.04.2019 European search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.03.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
11.03.2019 Description Search / examination 25
11.03.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Drawings Search / examination 5
11.03.2019 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 5
11.03.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.03.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24