EP3515084 - CORROSION RESISTANT TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Connectivity Belgium BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JAEGERE, Nicolas Tulpenlaan 26 B-2970 Schilde / BE | 02 /
CAMS, Eddy Luc Grotstraat 42A B-3740 Bilzen / BE | 03 /
RADELET, Christiaan Liersesteenweg 10A B-3200 Aarschot / BE | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2019/30] | Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19162058.2 | 01.05.2016 | [2019/30] | Priority number, date | US201562155944P | 01.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562155944 P | [2019/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3515084 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3515084 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/02 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
H04Q1/114 (EP,US);
H05K5/069 (US);
G02B6/4248 (US);
G02B6/4256 (US);
G02B6/4268 (US);
H04Q1/025 (EP,US);
H05K5/0247 (US);
H05K5/03 (US);
H05K5/04 (US);
H05K7/20409 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] |
Former [2019/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGES TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSGEHÄUSE | [2019/30] | English: | CORROSION RESISTANT TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENCLOSURE | [2019/30] | French: | ENCEINTE DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS RÉSISTANT À LA CORROSION | [2019/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 24.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16723954.0 / EP3289771 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.05.2016 | AL | 28.10.2020 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | HR | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | MK | 28.10.2020 | MT | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | RS | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | SM | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | NO | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | IE | 01.05.2021 | LU | 01.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 01.05.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MK | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.05.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
MK | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.05.2016 | |
AL | 28.10.2020 | ||
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
IE | 01.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
LU | 01.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 28.10.2020 | |
AT | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SM | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
HR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
RS | 28.10.2020 | ||
NO | 28.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004211774 (DAOUD BASSEL H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2006091001 (DRAPEAU RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0036] * * sentences 14-18, paragraph 37 *; | [A]US2009307984 (THOMPSON KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2010128456 (HUGHES MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2015070838 (CASEBOLT MATTHEW P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | EP3289771 |