EP3708736 - CONNECTION PROFILE FOR COMPONENTS BORDERING PLASTER WITH ARTICULATED HINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIKOV s.r.o. Blanenská 1859 66434 Kurim / CZ | [2020/43] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states all-tech Profile GmbH Großegg 12 9701 Rothenthurn - Spittal an der Drau / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kassmannhuber, Peter Großegg 12 9701 Rothenthurn an der Drau / AT | 02 /
Burant, Pavel Vohancice 72 666 01 Vohancice / CZ | 03 /
Toman, Radek Na klinku 724/5a 644 00 Brno / CZ | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Wirnsberger & Lerchbaum Patentanwälte OG Mühlgasse 3 8700 Leoben / AT | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 19162133.3 | 12.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708736 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708736 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/06, E06B1/62 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
E04F13/06 (EP);
E06B1/62 (EP);
E04F13/068 (EP);
E06B2001/624 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 02.02.2021 | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSPROFIL FÜR AN PUTZ ANGRENZENDE BAUTEILE MIT EINEM GELENKIGEN BEWEGUNGSSCHENKEL | [2020/38] | English: | CONNECTION PROFILE FOR COMPONENTS BORDERING PLASTER WITH ARTICULATED HINGE | [2020/38] | French: | PROFILÉ RACCORD POUR COMPOSANTS ADJACENTS AU CRÉPI DOTÉ D'UNE BRANCHE À MOUVEMENT ARTICULÉ | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 02.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE202005020164U (VWS BEFESTIGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [XA]EP1942237 (KASSMANNHUBER PETER [AT], et al); | [XA]DE102010044680 (BRAUN AUGUST [CH]) | Examination | EP3569791 |