EP3544056 - ESD PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Tours) SAS 10, Rue Thales de Milet 37100 Tours / FR | [2019/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNAUD, Aurélie 6, Rue Sarrail 37540 Saint-Cyr-sur-Loire / FR | 02 /
BRISCHETTO, Andrea Via Carlo Poma, 18 95122 Catania / IT | [2019/39] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 19162360.2 | 12.03.2019 | [2019/39] | Priority number, date | FR20180052428 | 21.03.2018 Original published format: FR 1852428 | [2019/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3544056 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02, H01L29/861 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
H01L27/0255 (EP,US);
H01L27/0248 (US);
H01L29/16 (US);
H01L29/861 (EP,US);
H02H9/046 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/39] | H01L27/02, H01L29/866 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESD-SCHUTZSCHALTKREIS UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/39] | English: | ESD PROTECTION CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2019/39] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION ESD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2019/39] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 10.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011163352 (GEE HARRY [US], et al); | [YA]US2013075747 (PURTELL ROBERT J [US]); | [I]EP2741330 (NXP BV [NL]); | [XYI]US2014319598 (BOBDE MADHUR [US]); | [A]US2018047718 (YAO FEI [CN], et al) |