EP3539678 - NO-DRIP HOT MELT GLUE GUN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADHESIVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3 Merrill Industrial Drive Hampton New Hampshire 03842 / US | [2021/15] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states ADHESIVE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3 Merrill Industrial Drive Hampton New Hampshire 03842 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belanger, Richard A. 1 Muddy Pond Road Kensington, New Hampshire 03833 / US | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Hanson, William Bennett Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Hanson, William Bennett Bromhead Johnson 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | ||
Former [2019/38] | Crouch, David John Bromhead Johnson 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19162562.3 | 13.03.2019 | [2019/38] | Priority number, date | US201862642759P | 14.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862642759 P | US201916295083 | 07.03.2019 Original published format: US201916295083 | [2019/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3539678 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3539678 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05C17/005 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
B05C17/0053 (EP,US);
B05C17/00533 (US);
B05C11/10 (CN);
B05C5/001 (CN);
B05C5/0225 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] |
Former [2019/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TROPFFREIE FÜR HEISSSCHMELZKLEBEPISTOLE | [2019/38] | English: | NO-DRIP HOT MELT GLUE GUN | [2019/38] | French: | PISTOLET À COLLE THERMOFUSIBLE ANTI-GOUTTE | [2019/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 17.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2019 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | TR | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 13.03.2019 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
MK | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4804110 (SPERRY CHARLES R [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 6 * * figure 10 *; | [A]US5375766 (SWEENEY STEPHEN J [GB]) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 40 - line 40 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6152386 (BULLOCK DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 5, line 19 - line 23 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO2006047090 (HYPERION INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0031] * * figure 2b *; | [A]US2008073448 (KENDALL JOHN KIRBY [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0057] ** figure 18 * |