EP3708024 - BRACELET CLASP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montres Breguet S.A. Place de la Tour 23 1344 L'Abbaye / CH | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCIASCIA, Fabio 1343 Les Charbonnières / CH | [2024/25] |
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
SCIASCIA, Fabio Rue des Fontaines 34 1412 Valeyres-sous-Ursins / CH | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 19163067.2 | 15.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708024 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708024 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/24, A44C5/14, G04B47/04 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
A44C5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ARMBANDVERSCHLUSS | [2020/38] | English: | BRACELET CLASP | [2020/38] | French: | FERMOIR DE BRACELET | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 16.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011147424 (HEMBO CLAUS SKOEDT [DK], et al); | [X]JP2016116592 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [XY]CH712040 (PATEK PHILIPPE SA GENEVE [CH]) |